Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2019cv21470
Date Filed2019-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cecilia M. Altonaga
PlaintiffAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Case DescriptionAmericans for Immigrant Justice submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning contracts or other relationships with medical providers serving various CBP stations in Texas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but as the result of confusion, the agency remanded the request for a further search. The agency eventually disclosed 342 partially redacted pages as part of an interim response, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AI Justice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-171COMPLAINT against Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11567399, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Summon(s), # 5 Summon(s), # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit)(Norris, Allison) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-172Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-183Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ar2) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-024ORDER that on or before July 16, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 4 : Show Cause Response due by 7/16/2019. (lk) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-135CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. on the Department of Homeland Security (Norris, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-136CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. on the United States Attorney General (Norris, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-137CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. on the Office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Florida (Norris, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-138CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. on United States Customs and Border Protection (Norris, Allison) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-139Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar