Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMuhammad v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2019cv11117
Date Filed2019-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Avern Cohn
PlaintiffDante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]
Case DescriptionDante Muhammed submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning his FHA loan. After the agency failed to respond, Muhammed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development Deborah R. Snowden, Office of the Executive Secretariat
DefendantGovernment National Mortgage Association Maren Kasper, Acting President / EVP & CEO
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-171COMPLAINT filed by Dante K. Muhammad against defendants (DPer) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-172APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Dante K. Muhammad. (DPer) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-184Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-225ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-22NOTICE of Error re 5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (MVer) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-226CORRECTED ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-227ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLETE SERVICE DOCUMENTS AND FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE U.S. MARSHAL Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-22TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 6 Order on Petition/Request/Application, 7 Order on Dante K. Muhammad at 24604 Templar Avenue, Southfield, MI 48075. (MVer) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2412Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Dante K. Muhammad (DTyl) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-258SUMMONS Issued for *Government National Mortgage Association, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development* (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation) (DPer) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-259ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2510SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation) (DPer) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2511ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-01Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]. (DPer) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar