Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVOTEVETS ACTION FUND v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01090
Date Filed2019-04-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffVOTEVETS ACTION FUND
Case DescriptionVoteVets Action Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the process for selecting members for the Board of Veterans' Appeals. VoteVets Action Fund also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told VoteVets Action Fund that there were 53 FOIA requests before theirs. After hearing nothing further from the agency, VoteVets Action Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6067170) filed by VOTEVETS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VOTEVETS ACTION FUND (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-183MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aman George, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - 202-701-1783. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6067193. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VOTEVETS ACTION FUND (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-19Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-19MINUTE ORDER granting the 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Aman George shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/19/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-195STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/19/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/24/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 4/23/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(George, Aman) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar