Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNEESE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01098
Date Filed2019-04-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffASHLEY BROOKE NEESE
Case DescriptionAshley Neese, a former Assistant U.S. Attorney in the Western District of Virginia, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys and the Office of Professional Responsibility for records concerning allegations made against her that resulted in her resignation. The agency acknowledged receipt of her request. EOUSA located 306 potentially responsive records. The agency withheld 208 records in full and 23 pages in part, citing Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Neese filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Neese filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6068651) filed by ASHLEY BROOKE NEESE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Civil Cover Sheet, # 36 Summons)(Barger, David) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-19Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-192SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-05-023RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/23/2019 (Barger, David) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar