Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01149
Date Filed2019-04-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Case DescriptionThe Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the extent of influence by financial industry representatives on OMB Director Mick Mulvaney while he was temporarily in charge of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. The Lawyers' Committee also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Lawyers' Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants United States Office of Management and Budget ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6074922) filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(McCarthy, John) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-23Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-232SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-233NOTICE of Appearance by Lyndsay Amelia Gorton on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Gorton, Lyndsay) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/24/2019 (McCarthy, John) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar