Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKuntz v. Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of North Dakota
CityWestern
Case Number1:2019cv00070
Date Filed2019-04-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Daniel L. Hovland
PlaintiffRiley S. Kuntz
Case DescriptionRiley Kuntz submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for his criminal history records. Kuntz also requested expedited processing. The agency denied his request for expedited processing. The FBI then denied his request. Kuntz filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kuntz filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDepartment of Justice Washington, DC 20530
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-221COMPLAINT against Department of Justice (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000867) filed by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(am) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-232Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (am) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-233NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Riley S. Kuntz. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/7/2019. (am) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-294CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Riley S. Kuntz. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(rh) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-295(Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (rh) Distributed on 4/29/2019. (rh) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-026CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riley S. Kuntz re 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office, 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(am) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-027CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Riley S. Kuntz re 2 Summons Issued as to Attorney General, 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Mailing Envelope)(am) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar