Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01175
Date Filed2019-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionSparacino PLLC, a law firm representing individuals who were injured as the result of terrorist attacks in Iraq, submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning corruption at the Iraqi Ministry of Health, including payments by medical service providers to obtain contracts, money which was allegedly used in part to finance terrorist attacks. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the four requests, Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-231COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6077867) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Branson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-232NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Goldsmith, Andrew) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-233NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Duffy on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-24Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-244SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-05-085ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew); Modified on 5/13/2019 (tth). (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-086ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/30/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew); Modified on 5/13/2019 (tth). (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/29/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-13NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. Summonses have not been issued for the United States Attorney and the United States Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar