Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWatts Constructors, LLC v. Department Of Defense et al
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv00500
Date Filed2019-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Anthony J Trenga
PlaintiffWatts Constructors, LLC
DefendantDepartment Of Defense
DefendantDepartment of the Army
DefendantUnited States Army Special Operations Command
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-241Complaint against Department of Defense, Department of the Army, United States Army Special Operations Command ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6606916.), filed by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 22 Letter Rule 7.1 Disclosure, # 23 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Farabow, Sara) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-242Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, Department of Defense by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-243Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, Department of the Army by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-244Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, United States Army Special Operations Command by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-245Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-24Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-256Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, to Department of Defense (serve Attorney General) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-257Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, to Department of Defense (serve US Attorney) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-258Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, to Department of Army (serve Attorney General) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-259Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, to Department of Army (serve US Attorney) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2510Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, to USASOC (serve Attorney General) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2511Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint,,, to USASOC (serve US Attorney) by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2612Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Department Of Defense (serve U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General), Department of the Army (serve U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General), United States Army Special Operations Command (serve U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-1513AFFIDAVIT of Service for Certified Mail as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Department of Defense on May 1, 2019, filed by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-1514AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Department of the Army on May 1, 2019, filed by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-1515AFFIDAVIT of Service by Certified Mail as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General for Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on United States Army Special Operations Command on May 1, 2019, filed by Watts Constructors, LLC. (Farabow, Sara) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar