Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01199
Date Filed2019-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Transportation and the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning communications between specified agency officials and individuals representing Airlines for America. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-251COMPLAINT against FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6080742) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-25Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-252SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-023LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/1/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION served on 5/1/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 4/30/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-065NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar