Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCascadia Wildlands v. Oregon Office of the State Director for USDA-APHIS Wildlife Services
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityEugene
Case Number6:2019cv00638
Date Filed2019-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael J. McShane
PlaintiffCascadia Wildlands an Oregon non-profit corporation
DefendantOregon Office of the State Director for USDA-APHIS Wildlife Services
DefendantAnimal and Plant Health Inspection Service - Wildlife Services an agency of the United States Department of Agriculture
DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture a federal department
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-261Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5827115. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Cascadia Wildlands against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Summons). (Cady, Nicholas) Modified on 4/26/2019 to add payment information. (eo) Modified text from plaintiffs to defendants on 4/26/2019. (kf) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-262Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/23/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 9/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued) (kf) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-293Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cady, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar