Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01255
Date Filed2019-04-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning communications to and from the agency pertaining to the sale of the Starrett City housing complex. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6090384) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons HUD)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-303CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-30Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/6/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 5/6/2019 (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar