Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHAWAII FIREARMS COALITION v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01260
Date Filed2019-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffHAWAII FIREARMS COALITION
Case DescriptionThe Hawaii Firearms Coalition submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the State of Hawaii's Rap Back program for firearms owners. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Hawaii Firearms Coalition filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-011COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6091605) filed by Hawaii Firearms Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA to FBI, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, # 3 Declaration LCvR 26.1 Certificate, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HAWAII FIREARMS COALITION. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-01Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-084NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Alexander Beck on behalf of HAWAII FIREARMS COALITION (Beck, Alan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/10/2019) (zjf). (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/6/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 5/6/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service on FBI, # 2 Exhibit Proof on service on Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Green card returns for US AG and US Attorney, # 4 Exhibit USPS Confirmation of delivery to FBI, # 5 Exhibit Receipts for postage)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar