Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJEON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01261
Date Filed2019-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJONG JEON
Case DescriptionJong Jeon submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records about himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jeon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-011COMPLAINT JONG JEON against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6091752) filed by JONG JEON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-01Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2019. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05-03-19. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/3/2019 (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-076NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar