Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBEVILL v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01280
Date Filed2019-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffMARY JOANNE SPRINGER BEVILL
Case DescriptionMary Springer submitted FOIA requests to the CIA and the Department of State for records concerning her father, Paul Le Baron Springer. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The CIA told Springer that it would not process her request without proof of death and ultimately denied the request on that basis. After hearing nothing further from the State Department, Springer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
201 Center Street, NW
DC, DC 20520
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-021COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6098147) filed by MARY JOANNE SPRINGER BEVILL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons CIA, # 5 Summons Dep't of State)(Sobel, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/3/2019) (zef, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/3/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-032SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-083GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/8/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar