Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSAVAGE v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01281
Date Filed2019-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffLEN SAVAGE
Case DescriptionLen Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the discussion of "automatically" or "single function of a trigger." He also requested records concerning his company Historic Arms, LLC and himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-021COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6098843) filed by LEN SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Foia to ATF with attachment, # 2 Exhibit Acknowledgement Letter, # 3 Summons Summons to ATF, # 4 Summons Summon to US Atty General, # 5 Summons Summons to US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified to omit the word civil cover sheet and just have the docket text read "complaint" on 5/3/2019 (zef, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 5/3/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-083RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES served on 5/7/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/7/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified mail return on Civil Process Clerk, # 2 Exhibit Proof of service on USA Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Certified mail return on USA Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit Proof of service on ATF, # 5 Exhibit Certified mail return on ATF)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-084GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/8/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar