Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01286
Date Filed2019-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the Department of Justice for records concerning foreign leases, purchases or transfers of properties owned or operated by the Trump Organization. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6100466) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to State, # 5 Summons as to DOJ)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-06Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-063SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-094ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/9/19. (DM) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-145MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th Street NW B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6123092. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar