Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDOE v. BENOIT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01253
Date Filed2019-04-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJ. Q. DOE
Case DescriptionJ.Q. Doe submitted FOIA requests to the Defense Contract Management Agency concerning its investigation of her based on allegations that she posed an insider threat under a policy established in 2011 by the Obama administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency denied her first request based on Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures), Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Doe filed an administrative appeal of the decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to her other requests or her administrative appeal, Doe filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantANDREA LYNNE BENOIT in her personal capacity
DefendantJOHN DOE Nos. 1 - 10, in their personal capacities
DefendantDEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDAVID H. LEWIS Vice Admiral, in his official capacity as Director of the Defense Contract Management Agency
DefendantPATRICK SHANAHAN in his official Capacity as Acting Secretary of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-301COMPLAINT against ANDREA LYNNE BENOIT, DEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE, DAVID H. LEWIS, PATRICK SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097810) with Jury Demand filed by J. Q. DOE. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth); Modified - Sealed at the request of counsel on 5/8/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-04-302SEALED MOTION filed by J. Q. DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ztth) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-04-303SEALED DOCUMENT (Reference List) filed by J. Q. DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (ztth) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-04-304MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 4/30/2019. (tth) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-04-305SEALED DOCUMENT filed by J. Q. DOE. "FILE UNDER SEAL" by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 4/29/2019. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (ztth) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-04-306SEALED DOCUMENT (Complaint) filed by J. Q. DOE. re 1 Complaint, filed by J. Q. DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (ztth) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-017SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to ANDREA LYNNE BENOIT, DEFENSE CONTRACT MANAGEMENT AGENCY, DAVID H. LEWIS, PATRICK SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-088MOTION To Seal re 1 Complaint, by J. Q. DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilliard, Gerald); Modified event on 5/9/2019 (tth). (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-089ERRATA by J. Q. DOE 1 Complaint, filed by J. Q. DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gilliard, Gerald) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 8 Motion to Seal the Complaint. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's 1 Complaint shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 8, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-1610NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Brian McClanahan on behalf of J. Q. DOE (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar