Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01301
Date Filed2019-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce, the Department of State, and the Department of the Treasury for records concerning communications to or from the White House pertaining to casino operator Sheldon Adelson. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. American Oversight also submitted a second FOIA request to the Department of State and the Department of the Treasury for records of communications to or from Sheldon Adelson or anyone acting on his behalf. The agencies acknowledged receipt of that request. American Oversight submitted a third FOIA request to the Department of State and the Department of the Treasury for records concerning meetings in Washington, DC that involved Sheldon Adelson. The agencies acknowledged receipt of those requests. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies pertaining to any of its requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6104638) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Commerce, # 5 Summons to U.S. Department of State, # 6 Summons to U.S. Department of the Treasury)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-07Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-073SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-074STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/7/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-145MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St. NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6123178. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Anthony, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting the 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel Katherine M. Anthony shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/14/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/13/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 5/13/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/13/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/13/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-057NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-078ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-07MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/7/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar