Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Legal Assistance Group v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv04028
Date Filed2019-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffNew York Legal Assistance Group
Case DescriptionThe New York Legal Assistance Group submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the agency's policies for referring educational institutions to the Federal Trade Commission for investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, the New York Legal Assistance Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-061COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16826778)Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group.(Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-063FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) Modified on 5/7/2019 (pc). (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-07***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Danielle Feldman Tarantolo to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the FIOA summons form not the standard AO 440 summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-07CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-07Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-07Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-074REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-085ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (dnh) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-106SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 5/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-107SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-108SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 5/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk Supervisor. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-169NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey Kyung-Se Lee on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-06-0610LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Casey K. Lee dated June 6, 2019. Document filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.(Lee, Casey) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-0611ORDER granting 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Casey K. Lee dated June 6, 2019. Document filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/6/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Veterans Affairs answer due 6/24/2019. (rjm) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar