Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01318
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the EPA, the Department of Agriculture, and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning meetings and discussions between agency officials and the trade association CropLife America, which represents pesticide manufacturers. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6107071) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons United States Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Environmental Protection Agency, # 5 Summons Fish and Wildlife Service, # 6 Summons Department of Agriculture)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-073MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Carter Evans, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway, Suite 800, Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 510-844-7118. Fax No. - n/a Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6107443. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Evans, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-084SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-085STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting the 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan Carter Evans shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-086NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Evans on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/16/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 5/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-249RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 5/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2410RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 5/17/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2411RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-06-1112Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar