Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01325
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the withdrawal of a memorandum pertaining to use of agricultural practices in wildlife management in the National Wildlife Refuge System. The agency disclosed records but withheld a total of 349 pages. PEER filed an administrative appeal of the denial, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6108080) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Summons AG summons, # 3 Summons Agency Summons, # 4 Summons USAO summons)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/8/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-284NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar