Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01326
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning monthly invoices and inventories for each Off-Range Pasture. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Wild Horse Freedom Federation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6108386) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-08Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-083GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/8/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-06-054NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-075NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-106Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-12MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/12/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar