Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCooper v. Department of the Treasury et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv02056
Date Filed2019-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Charles A. Pannell, Jr
PlaintiffGarth Cooper
Case DescriptionGarth Cooper submitted five FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning returns signed by him as well as various agency policies. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cooper filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of the Treasury
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
DefendantCommissioner of Internal Revenue
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-071COMPLAINT filed by Garth Cooper. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 112353) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-102Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (tcc) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-103Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (tcc) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-104Summons Issued as to Department of the Treasury. (tcc) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-145Return of Service Executed by Garth Cooper. Commissioner of Internal Revenue served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-146Return of Service Executed by Garth Cooper. Department of the Treasury served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-147Return of Service Executed by Garth Cooper. Internal Revenue Service served on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar