Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01349
Date Filed2019-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionSparacino PLLC, a law firm representing hundreds of U.S. citizens who had family members killed or injured in Iraq, filed eight complex FOIA requests with the Department of State for records pertaining to the Iraq war. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and responded to three of them. But after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its other five requests, Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-081COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6112629) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Civil Cover Sheet, # 28 Summons)(Branson, Joshua) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-082NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Goldsmith, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-083NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Duffy on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-094SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-315NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 13, 2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/13/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-059GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/5/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-1110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar