Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROBERTS v. OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01306
Date Filed2019-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffVERNON ROBERTS
DefendantOFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS of the United States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-03Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/03/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-031COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS filed by VERNON ROBERTS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-032MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VERNON ROBERTS (zsb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-173ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $0 from Prison Account of VERNON ROBERTS and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/16//2019. (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-17Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-234SUMMONS (3) Issued as to OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-06-105MOTION for Reconsideration re 3 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, by VERNON ROBERTS. (tth) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/29/2019. (tth) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar