Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01367
Date Filed2019-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffLEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI
Case DescriptionLegal Services of Eastern Missouri submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning the agency's involvement with public housing in Wellston, Missouri. LSEM also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and the agency asked LSEM to narrow the scope of its request. LSEM did so. The agency denied LSEM's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency disclosed 17 pages responsive to the first part of LSEM's request but redacted portions under Exemption 5 (privileges). After the government shutdown ended, HUD disclosed an additional 179 pages responsive to the second part of LSEM's request. It again redacted large portions of the records under Exemption 5. LSEM filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld the agency's invocation of Exemption 5 but remanded the records for further segregation. As a result, HUD re-released two pages with fewer deletions. LSEM then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6118442) filed by LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to HUD, # 4 Summons to United States Attorney)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-13Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/14/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/13/2019. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-155NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-166NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-207STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/20/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-298RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/20/2019. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-139ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar