Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01371
Date Filed2019-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST
Case DescriptionRestore Public Trust submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce for emails sent by or to named officials during specified dates and/or pertaining to specific subjects. Restore Public Trust also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Restore Public Trust filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6119197) filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons U.S. Dept. of Commerce, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Supplement Certificate per LCvR 26.1)(Massey, Jonathan) (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/14/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-14Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-214STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/21/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-06-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 5/20/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/20/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/20/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/19/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service as to U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service as to U.S. Attorney for DC)(Massey, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar