Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01377
Date Filed2019-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning emails and email attachments sent to wildhorse@blm.gov from May 1, 2018 through July 17, 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. WHFF contacted the agency several times to check on the status of its request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, WHFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-131COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6120431) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-14Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-06-053NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar