Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01387
Date Filed2019-05-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for emails and email attachments sent to or from Debbie Collins, Outreach Specialist for the agency's Wild Horse & Burro program, for the period April 16, 2018 through April 20, 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. WHFF contacted the agency several times for an estimated date of completion. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, WHFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-141COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6122997) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-16Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-233STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/23/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-06-054NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar