Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01409
Date Filed2019-05-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffLEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Levi & Korsinsky, representing Tesla shareholders, submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the agency's investigation of Tesla founder Elon Musk's twitter activity and the settlement between the agency and Musk. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It disclosed the public complaint against Musk but withheld all other records under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). Levi & Korsinsky filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld its Exemption 7(A) claim but made a discretionary release of records showing how each commissioner voted. The law firm then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6126176) filed by LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-16Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-162SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-283REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-294SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2019. (Porritt, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar