Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLatinoJustice PRLDEF et al v. Department of the Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv04417
Date Filed2019-05-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Paul Oetken
PlaintiffLatinoJustice PRLDEF
PlaintiffCenter for Constitutional Rights
PlaintiffCentro de Periodismo Investigativo
Case DescriptionThe Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, LatinoJustice, and the Center for Constitutional Rights submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning the operations of the fiscal oversight board appointed to oversee Puerto Rico's fiscal affairs. The requesters also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the request for expedited processing. The agency also suggested that the request be narrowed. The requesters filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. The requesters had several discussions with the agency as to the scope of the search. But after the agency failed to provide any substantive response, the requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Treasury
DefendantDepartment of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-16Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for 1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16888072, paid on 5/15/2019. (jgo) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 1 Complaint titled for the District of Columbia. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jgo) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/21/2019. (jgo) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-161COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Treasury. Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Bannan, Natasha) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bannan, Natasha) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-163FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sec. Steven Mnuchin, U.S. Department of Treasury, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Bannan, Natasha) Modified on 5/17/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Department of Treasury. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (dnh) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (dnh) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed on the PDF and the 'as to' docket entry must directly correspond to the party of record. Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name on the Summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-174FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Treasury, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Bannan, Natasha) Modified on 5/20/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-20***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Natasha Lycia Ora Bannan to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party names throughout the PDF and the docket entry must exactly match the party of record ( Department of the Treasury ). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-205REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of the Treasury, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Centro de Periodismo Investigativo, LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Bannan, Natasha) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-216ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of the Treasury. (dnh) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-247SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Department of the Treasury served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service was accepted by Renee Gordon, Executive Assistant. Document filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF; Centro de Periodismo Investigativo; Center for Constitutional Rights. (Bannan, Natasha) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar