Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGrassroots Leadership v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2019cv00530
Date Filed2019-05-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffGrassroots Leadership
Case DescriptionGrassroots Leadership submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's fee waiver policies particularly in relation to records concerning the agency's Violence Against Women's Act program. Grassroots Leadership also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Grassroots Leadership that it was granting its request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Grassroots Leadership filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-161COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12121835). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Grassroots Leadership. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Susan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/17/2019 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-202REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Watson, Susan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/21/2019 to flatten form) (lt). (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-213Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(lt) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar