Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRYSHMAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01444
Date Filed2019-05-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffBERNARD FRYSHMAN
Case DescriptionBernard Fryshman submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the Jewish cemetery located in Vilnius, Lithuania from 2015 through 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. A year later, the agency located 22 documents. The agency disclosed 12 documents in full, eight documents with redactions, and withheld two documents entirely under Exemption 5 (privileges). Fryshman filed an administrative appeal challenging the exemption claims and questioning the adequacy of the agency's search. The agency decided Fryshman's appeal by disclosing seven of eight documents previously redacted in full. Fryshman then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-171COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6131899) filed by BERNARD FRYSHMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Beck, Gregory) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-20Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-20SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-202REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by BERNARD FRYSHMAN. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by BERNARD FRYSHMAN.(Beck, Gregory) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-213SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (jf) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-304NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar