Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. Bernhardt et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv01443
Date Filed2019-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the importation of African elephant skins and products from 2012 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located 847 pages and withheld parts of 496 pages under Exemption 4 (confidential business information), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Friends of Animals filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDavid Bernhardt in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Interior
DefendantU.S. Fish and Wildlife Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-211COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6697586)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals.(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-212NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Friends of Animals (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-213SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jessie K. Liu, William Barr, David Bernhardt, USFWS by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-214Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-215SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-226MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01443-MEH. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-227Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-238MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/23/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-06-149SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1410SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) David Bernhardt served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar