Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-05-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6136107) filed by NORTHERN VIRGINIA CAPITAL DEFENDER OFFICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-05-21 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher M. Proczko, :Firm- Ballard Spahr LLP, :Address- 200 IDS Center, 80 South 8th St., Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - 612.371.3545. Fax No. - 612.371.3207 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6136137. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORTHERN VIRGINIA CAPITAL DEFENDER OFFICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Proczko in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-05-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-22 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 22, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/23/2019. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/24/2019. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 5/28/2019 (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-24 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before July 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 2, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-07-24 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT dated July 24, 2019 by NORTHERN VIRGINIA CAPITAL DEFENDER OFFICE. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 25, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-07-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (kh) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 15, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 18, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/19/2019) |
2019-09-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019. (zkh) (Entered: 09/19/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT and proposed order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 15, 2020, if the parties have not yet stipulated to dismissal by that date. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 15, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2020-01-15 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 16, 2020, if the parties have not yet stipulated to dismissal by that date. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 15, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-03-06 | 12 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/06/2020) |
2020-03-06 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in light of the parties' 12 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 6, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/06/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |