Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club v. United States Department of Interior
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv02838
Date Filed2019-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffSierra Club
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications between agency officials and outside parties. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-221COMPLAINT against United States Department of Interior. Filed by Sierra Club. (Paid; Receipt No: 0971-13373423) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to E to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-222***Incorrect PDF attached; See dkt. 5 *** Proposed Summons. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/28/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-233Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-244Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-245Proposed Summons. (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-246NOTICE by Sierra Club of Related Case (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-247Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Richmond, Ellen) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-288Summons Issued as to United States Department of Interior and U.S. Attorney General. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-299ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 50 (filed in Case No. 18-cv-0797) Administrative Motion to Relate Case to Case No. 19-cv-02838. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-30Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-3110CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/22/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar