Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01492
Date Filed2019-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records. The first request asked for Program Participation Agreements between the agency and the Art Institute of Houston and several other art institutes. NSLDN also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted NSLDN's request for a fee waiver. NSLDN submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning letters of credit posted by any schools owned or operated by Dream Center Foundation or Dream Center Educational Holdings. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request as well. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6138793) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-22Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/28/2019 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-035NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander S. Elson on behalf of NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-116NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Rothschild on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rothschild, Eric) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar