Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01507
Date Filed2019-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior, all other cabinet departments, the EPA, OMB, the Council of Inspector Generals, and Amtrak for records concerning the implementation of the foreseeable harm standard in the FOIA. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantWHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantCOUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
DefendantNATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
doing business as AMTRAK
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6142017) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 5 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 6 Summons DOI, # 7 Summons USDA, # 8 Summons DOC, # 9 Summons DOEd, # 10 Summons HHS, # 11 Summons DHS, # 12 Summons DOJ, # 13 Summons State, # 14 Summons Treasury, # 15 Summons DOT, # 16 Summons EPA, # 17 Summons OMB, # 18 Summons CIGIE, # 19 Summons Amtrak)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-233NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-234SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/28/2019; WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 5/28/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY served on 5/28/2019; NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION served on 5/28/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 5/28/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-298RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar