Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01515
Date Filed2019-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning communications between agency officials and student loan organizations. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
1700 G Street NW
Washington, DC 20552
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-231COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6143308) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-24Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-314ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/31/2019. (DM) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION served on 5/28/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar