Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. UNITED STATES HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01551
Date Filed2019-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Human Right Defense Center, previously Prison Legal News, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning past and current contracts between the agency and the Vera Institute of Justice. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-281COMPLAINT against HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6147807) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/30/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-30Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar