Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGARZA VARGAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01553
Date Filed2019-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffFRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS a native and citizen of Mexico
Case DescriptionFrancisco Garza Vargas, a Mexican citizen, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision to revoke his tourist visa. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then disclosed 20 documents in full and 10 in part and told Garza Vargas that a provision of the Immigration and Nationality Act prohibited the agency from disclosing anything beyond what a visa applicant had provided themselves. Garza Vargas filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Garza Vargas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148131 (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Huang, Xiaosheng) # 2 Civil Cover Sheet (zef, ). Modified text and order of documents on 6/3/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-282MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eva Garcia-Mendoza, :Firm- Law Offices of Eva Garcia-Mendoza, :Address- 501 S 7th St., Las Vegas, NV 89101. Phone No. - 702-384-8484. Fax No. - 702-384-0207 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS (Huang, Xiaosheng) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-283AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by FRANCISCO GARZA VARGAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, Xiaosheng) Modified event title on 6/4/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-06-03Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-034SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-05MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eva Garcia-Mendoza is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/5/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar