Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01554
Date Filed2019-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Human Rights Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning memoranda of understanding between the agency and Vera Institute of Justice regarding the latter's work with immigrants and refugees. HRDC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148044) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/30/2019) (zef, ). Modified text on 5/30/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-30Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-302SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-073NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar