Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-05-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148072) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Ban, Victor) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-30 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U. S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-04 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/29/2019. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-04 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/30/2019. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-04 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U. S. MARSHALS SERVICE served on 5/30/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/30/2019 (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-06-30 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of All Defendants (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2019) |
2019-06-30 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U. S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 06/30/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants shall file an Answer to the Complaint or propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by not later than 8/06/2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 7/02/2019. (zad) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U. S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 16, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 14, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-08-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-09-11 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Berkeley Hulnick on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 17, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-09-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-10-14 | 11 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. Attorney Victor Duen-Li Ban terminated. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 10/14/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by January 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 18, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2020. (mac) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2020-01-14 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 14, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-03-06 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 03/06/2020) |
2020-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 8, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/08/2020) |
2020-03-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/5/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-05-05 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 5, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-07-06 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 07/06/2020) |
2020-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 7, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/07/2020) |
2020-07-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/07/2020) |
2020-08-20 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hulnick, Blake) (Entered: 08/20/2020) |
2020-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by October 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 21, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/21/2020) |
2020-08-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 08/21/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 18 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U. S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |