Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01557
Date Filed2019-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Human Rights Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning all claims filed against the agency for amounts of $1,000 or more. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked HRDC to narrow the scope of its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, HRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-281COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148144) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Ban, Victor) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-06-03Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-032SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-033STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/3/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/3/2019. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/03/2019. (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/3/2019 (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-057REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-068SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-069RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served on 6/6/2019 (Ban, Victor) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar