Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHunton Andrews Kurth LLP v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityRichmond
Case Number3:2019cv00399
Date Filed2019-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge M. Hannah Lauck
PlaintiffHunton Andrews Kurth LLP
Riverfront Plaza - East Tower
951 East Byrd Street
Richmond, VA 23219
DefendantU.S. Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-281Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6661825.), filed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrou, Douglas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/29/2019) (jsau, ). (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-282Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-29Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-29Notice of Correction re 2 Proposed Summons. Filing attorney notified that proposed summonses are needed for the U.S. Attorney as well as the Attorney General. Attorney will submit additional "proposed summons" via email. Clerk will file and prepare summons as requested. (jsau, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-293Summons Issued as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-044Certificate Reporting Service by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. U.S. Food and Drug Administration served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (jsau, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-115SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-116SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-117SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-118SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP. (Garrou, Douglas) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-12Notice of Correction re: 5 , 6 , 7 , 8 . Filing attorney notified of correct filing procedures when filing a Summons Return. (jsau, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-269Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hambrick, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2710ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant, having moved this Court for an extension of time within which to file its answer; Plaintiff having consented to the requested extension; and finding good cause for the requested extension, it is therefore ORDERED that Defendant shall have an extension of time up to and including Monday, September 16, 2019, in which to file its answer. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/27/19. (jsau, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar