Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBAKAJ v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01580
Date Filed2019-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffANDREW BAKAJ
Case DescriptionAndrew Bakaj, a former employee of the CIA Inspector General's Office who lost his job because of retaliation for whistleblower activity pertaining to the CIA Inspector General, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for an investigation conducted by the DHS IG into allegations of misconduct by the CIA IG. Bakaj also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bakaj filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
STOP-0655
245 Murray Lane, SW
Washington, DC 20528
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-291COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6152948) filed by ANDREW BAKAJ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-292Ex Parte MOTION File Complaint Using a Pseudonym and Using Counsel's Address by ANDREW BAKAJ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-303NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of ANDREW BAKAJ (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-04Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-044SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar