Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDELGROSSO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01567
Date Filed2019-05-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffPHILIP DELGROSSO sui juris, a man, an act of God, and a foreign and immune state
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantWILLIAM BARR
DefendantWILLIAM P. BARR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-24Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/24/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-241COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by PHILIP DELGROSSO.(zeg). (Main Document 1 replaced to reflect I-Deck label on 6/6/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-242MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PHILIP DELGROSSO (zeg). (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-113PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case without prejudice. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zeg) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-184NOTICE of Objection by PHILIP DELGROSSO (zsb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-07-235NOTICE of Demand for Status Update by PHILIP DELGROSSO (zsb) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar