Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDANIEL v. DIRECTOR OF FOIA OPERATIONS USCIS et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2019cv13039
Date Filed2019-05-29
Date Closed2019-06-10
JudgeJudge Susan D. Wigenton
PlaintiffHENRIETTA DANIEL
DefendantDIRECTOR OF FOIA OPERATIONS USCIS
DefendantUSCIS OFFICER M. OWENS
DefendantDIRECTOR, USCIS ATLANTA OFFICE
DefendantDIRECTOR, USCIS NEWARK OFFICE
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-05-291Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(ld, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-072ORDERED that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint is sua sponte DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 6/7/2019. (JB, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-10***Civil Case Terminated. (JB, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar