Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGal v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv03070
Date Filed2019-06-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffAndreas Gal
Case DescriptionAndreas Gal, a naturalized U.S. citizen working in the tech industry, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning an incident in which Gal was detained by customs officials at San Francisco International Airport who tried to coerce him into providing password information for his cell phone and laptop. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Gal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
DefendantUnited States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-031COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT, 5 U.S.C. § 552 ET SEQ. AND THE PRIVACY ACT, 5 U.S.C. § 552a ET SEQ. against United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13403047.). Filed byAndreas Gal. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-032Civil Cover Sheet by Andreas Gal . (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-033Proposed Summons. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-034Certificate of Interested Entities by Andreas Gal (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/3/2019) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-045Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-056Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-057Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-068CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andreas Gal (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-079CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andreas Gal Amended w/ Attachment (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-1010CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andreas Gal.. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-1011CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andreas Gal (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-2812CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/5/2019 is reset to 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0213STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer filed by United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 7/2/2019) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0214CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection.. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 7/2/2019) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-1915Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief byUnited States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar