Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01617
Date Filed2019-06-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the agency's interpretation of a provision pertaining to irrigation of lands contained in the Colorado River Basin Project Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further, CBD informed the agency that it had failed to respond within the statutory time limit. After several further attempts to contact the agency pertaining to the status of its request were unsuccessful, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6161623) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for U.S. Department of the Interior, # 3 Summons Summons for District Attorney's Office of the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Wolf, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2019) (zjd). (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-04Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zjd) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-044CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY . (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/11/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/10/2019 (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-276ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-037ORDER directing the government to file a Vaughn index and supporting dispositive motion within thirty days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/02/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions and Vaughn Index due by 8/2/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-188Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-189Joint MOTION to Stay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (See Docket Entry 8 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-1910ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. The parties shall file a further status report on or before August 30, 2019 informing the Court of the status of production and a suggested briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/19/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar